Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mcgrath, Nancy T, Morin, Jo Ann, Tacy, Margaret T, Willard, Beth A,, Willard, Billi Jean, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Dissolution - Commercial case represented by Melnik, Esq., Patrick J, Plumb, Jr., Esq., Jerry B, against Bill Willard Incorporated, represented by Tanner, Esq., Mark Allan, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Mark D. Mason presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2017 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeDissolution |
Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Jonathan R Goldsmith, Esq.
Date: August 05, 2021Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Jonathan R Goldsmith, Esq.
Date: May 07, 2019Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Jonathan R Goldsmith, Esq.
Date: February 28, 2019Affidavit of Jonathan R. Goldsmith in support of joint motion to impound
Date: June 20, 2017Endorsement on Motion to appoint receiver (#3.0): ALLOWED
Date: April 13, 2017Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: March 28, 2017Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 03/28/2017
Date: March 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for authorization to make a fourth and final distribution to the shareholders of Bill Willard, Inc. (#41.0): ALLOWED by agreement with assent of all parties. | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Discharge with Receiver's Final Reports/Accounting (#42.0): Other action taken Receiver's final report and accounting having been filed and agreed to by all parties, the receivership shall be closed and terminated, with the receiver being discharged of his duties, again all by agreement, forthwith. Judge: Jekanowski, Jr., Harry | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Other Interested Party Jonathan R Goldsmith's Assented to Motion for Discharge with Receiver's Final Report/Accounting | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Jonathan R Goldsmith, Esq. | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Other Interested Party Jonathan R Goldsmith's Assented to Motion for Authorization to make a fourth and final distribution to the shareholders of Bill Willard, Inc. | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned The receiver anticipates filing his final report/accounting and motion for discharge within the next 7 to 10 days. Applies To: Goldsmith, Esq., Jonathan R (Attorney) on behalf of Goldsmith, Jonathan R (Other interested party) | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 07/16/2021 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER: approving receiver's assented to motion for authorization to make a third interim distribution to the shareholders of Bill Willard, Sr. | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for authorization to make a third interim distribution to the shareholders of Bill Willard, Inc. (#38.0): ALLOWED Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Jonathan R Goldsmith, Esq.Jonathan R Goldsmith |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.