Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Easthampton Savings Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lange, Esq., Joseph J, against Bernier, Ruth, Bernier, Sr., David H, Dimartini, Katherine A, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Joseph J Lange, Esq.
Date: March 29, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: January 23, 2017Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 01/23/2017
Date: January 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage. AMENDED Applies To: Bernier, Sr, David H (Defendant); Bernier, Ruth (Defendant); Katherine A DiMartini Formerly Known As Katherine A Torrey (Defendant) | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Default: 55(a) re: Foreclosure AMENDED Applies To: Bernier, Sr, David H (Defendant); Bernier, Ruth (Defendant); Katherine A DiMartini Formerly Known As Katherine A Torrey (Defendant) | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage. Applies To: Bernier, Sr, David (Defendant); Bernier, Ruth (Defendant); Katherine A DiMartini Formerly Known As Katherine A Torrey (Defendant) Vacated. Scribners error: Attest: Nancy A. Foley | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Default: 55(a) re: Foreclosure Applies To: Bernier, Sr, David (Defendant); Bernier, Ruth (Defendant); Katherine A DiMartini Formerly Known As Katherine A Torrey (Defendant) Vacated Scribners error. Attest Nancy A. Foley | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Easthampton Savings Bank's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Bernier, Sr, David (Defendant); Bernier, Ruth (Defendant); Katherine A DiMartini Formerly Known As Katherine A Torrey (Defendant) | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant David Bernier, Sr, Ruth Bernier, Katherine A DiMartini Formerly Known As Katherine A Torrey are not in the Military | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Bernier, Sr, David, Ruth Ann Bernier and Katherine A DiMartini a/k/a: Service made via regular mail; | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Joseph J Lange, Esq. | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Plaintiff's request for order authorizing foreclosure. | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER of notice by publication of foreclosure in Daily Hampshire Gazette issued returnable on 3/23/2017. Order of Notice mailed to Attorney Joseph J. Lange |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.