Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Presley, Denise L., filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Presley, Esq., Denise L, against American Home Shield, A Delaware Corporation, represented by Di Bartolo, Esq., Charcretia V, Vacarella, Esq., Chad, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
|
Received from Defendant American Home Shield, a Delaware Corporation: Answer to original complaint;
Date: September 22, 2016Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Denise L. Presley, Esq.
Date: September 15, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 26, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 08/26/2016
Date: August 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Denise L Presley's original complaint | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant American Home Shield, a Delaware Corporation: Answer to original complaint; | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date CharCretia V Di Bartolo, Esq. and Chad M. Vacarella Esq. added for Defendant American Home Shield, a Delaware Corporation | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Denise L. Presley, Esq. | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 08/26/2016 | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Denise L. Presley, Esq. added for Plaintiff Denise L. Presley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.