Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Carmody, Previously D B A Custom Builder & Masonry, Shawn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Se, against Bank Of America, N.A., Wansick, Peter J, White, Stacia A, White, Warren A, represented by Mccann, Iii, Esq., John H, Wagner, Esq., Dean J, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Service Returned for Defendant White, Warren A: Service made at last and usual;
Date: September 09, 2016Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i)
Date: January 13, 2017Endorsement on Motion to extend time for responding (#8.0): ALLOWED
Date: November 16, 2016Endorsement on Motion to file a response of pleading (#7.0): ALLOWED
Date: October 17, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.: Service made in hand;
Date: September 30, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Wansick, Peter J: Service made at last and usual;
Date: September 09, 2016Service Returned for Defendant White, Stacia A: Service made at last and usual;
Date: September 09, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 29, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 07/29/2016
Date: July 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Bank Of America, N.A.'s original complaint | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.: Dismissed by agreement of parties; | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend time for responding (#8.0): ALLOWED | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.'s Assented to Motion to extend time for response | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John H McCann, III, Esq. added for Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Dean J. Wagner, Esq. added for Defendant Bank Of America, N.A. | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to file a response of pleading (#7.0): ALLOWED | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.'s Assented to Motion to file a response of pleading | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.: Service made in hand; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.