Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Miller, Charles, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Melnik, Jr., Esq., Patrick J, against Dudek, Charles, Flory, Oso, Lockwood, Applicant For Zoning Permit, Robert, Mann, Charles, Zoning Board Of Appeals Of The Town Of Williamsburg, (total of 5) See All represented by Miranda, Esq., Thomas A, Murray, Esq., Carolyn M, Waterfall, Esq., David, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Charles Miller's Memorandum in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment. (supplemental)
Date: February 23, 2017List of exhibits Two additional exhibits B and C
Date: February 23, 2017Affidavit of William Turner
Date: February 23, 2017General correspondence regarding Statement of Facts for Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 23, 2017Charles Miller's Memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment
Date: February 23, 2017Plaintiff Charles Miller's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56
Date: February 23, 2017Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Patrick J. Melnik, Jr., Esq.
Date: July 01, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 22, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 06/22/2016
Date: June 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMARY JUDGMENT for Defendant(s), Zoning Board of Appeals of the Town of Williamsburg against Plaintiff(s), Charles Miller, without statutory costs.It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: that Charles Miller's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and the Defendant Town of Williamsburg Zoning Board of Appeal's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is ALLOWED. | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM & ORDER: on plaintiff's motion and Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment. | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (#8.0): Other action taken Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment DENIED and Defendant, Town of Williamsburg Zoning Board of Appeals cross-motion for summary judgment is ALLOWED. See memo #10. | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Matter taken under advisement The following event: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled for 04/20/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held - Under advisement | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Lockwood, Applicant for Zoning Permit, Robert: Answer to original complaint; | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas A Miranda, Esq. added for Defendant Robert Lockwood, Applicant for Zoning Permit | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 02/24/2017 10:42:59 | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Charles Miller's Memorandum in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment. (supplemental) | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | List of exhibits Two additional exhibits B and C | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Melnik, Jr., Esq., Patrick J. (Attorney) on behalf of Miller, Charles (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.