Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Lashway, Christopher, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Green, Jr., Esq., John Joseph, Miles, Esq., Harry L, against Koski, Iii, Cyrus P., represented by Mccormick, Esq., Jeffrey Lefferts, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Plaintiff Christopher Lashway's Assented to Motion to remove from November trial list
Date: November 01, 2018General correspondence regarding special verdict questions
Date: October 29, 2018Pre-Trial ORDER: September 2018 Trial List Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Date: February 05, 2018Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: February 05, 2018Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 10, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 10, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 06/10/2016
Date: June 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Christopher Lashway's original complaint | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 05/06/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding Staff: Harry Jekanowski, Jr., Clerk of Courts
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: John Joseph Green, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Harry L Miles, Esq. Attorney: Jeffrey Lefferts McCormick, Esq. | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 06/17/2019 | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event trial month for March 2019 to May 2019 (#18.0): ALLOWED | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 03/04/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Richard J Carey, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Harry Jekanowski, Jr., Clerk of Courts
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Christopher Lashway, Cyrus P. Koski, III Also Known As John Sikoski's Joint Motion for postponement of trial03/04/2019 09:00 AM Trial Ready | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for removal from November Trial List (#17.0): ALLOWED by agreement continued at present without prejudice to March 2019 Trial List Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 11/05/2018 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Richard J Carey, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Harry Jekanowski, Jr., Clerk of Courts
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Christopher Lashway's Assented to Motion to remove from November trial list |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.