Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dietz Construction Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen, Esq., Alan Mark, against Berkley Regional Insurance Company Directley And Through Its Agent Berkley Surety Group, Llc, James J. Welch & Co, Inc, James J. Welch & Co., Inc., represented by Bryant, Esq., Sara Pilar, Oconnor, Esq., Brian James, O'Connor, Esq., Kevin John, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2015 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Alan Mark Cohen, Esq. as to tracking order
Date: December 08, 2015Opposition to #19 motion for protective order filed by Dietz Construction Corp
Date: December 30, 2016Richard C Relich's Memorandum in support of his motion for protective order.
Date: December 30, 2016Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Alan Mark Cohen, Esq.
Date: December 16, 2016Plaintiff Dietz Construction Corp's Motion to amend the Second Amended Complaint
Date: December 05, 2016Amended: amended complaint filed by Dietz Construction Corp
Date: November 23, 2015Endorsement on Motion to take motion off list (#8.0): ALLOWED
Date: November 23, 2015General correspondence regarding Corporate disclosure statement
Date: November 16, 2015Affidavit of David Dietz., Verified.
Date: November 16, 2015Affidavit of filed by David Dietz.
Date: November 16, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: November 16, 2015Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 11/16/2015
Date: November 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Dietz Construction Corp's original complaint | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Alan Mark Cohen, Esq. Attorney: Sara Pilar Bryant, Esq. Attorney: Kevin John O'Connor, Esq. Attorney: Brian James OConnor, Esq. Attorney: Jonathan Richard Hausner, Esq. | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 06/07/2017 | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Alan Mark Cohen, Esq. Attorney: Sara Pilar Bryant, Esq. Attorney: Kevin John O'Connor, Esq. Attorney: Brian James OConnor, Esq. Attorney: Jonathan Richard Hausner, Esq. | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#22.0): ALLOWED by fax on 2/16/17. Hearing on the two motions is continued to 3/7/17 @ 2:00 p.m. A protective order is issued postponing Mr. Relich's deposition and compliance with the subject subpoenas pending further order. | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Dietz Construction Corp's Joint Motion to continue / reschedule an event 02/16/2017 02:00 PM Motion Hearing | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 02/16/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of parties | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#21.0): continue hearing on motion for leave to amend complaint and for protective order ALLOWED by agreement. Continued to Thursday February 16, 2017 at 2:00pm. No further notice to issue. | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Alan Mark Cohen, Esq. notice of motion to amend |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.