Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Madowitz, Richard M, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Weinberg, Esq., Paul S, against Kohl, Benedict, Merrell, Rachel, represented by Aleo, Esq., Michael E, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
|
Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 11/09/2015
Date: November 06, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: November 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs as to Benedict Kohl Co-Administrator/Administratrix of the Estate of Douglas Kohl, Rachel Merrell Co-Administrator/Administratrix of the Estate of Douglas Kohl's | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Benedict Kohl Co-Administrator/Administratrix of the Estate of Douglas Kohl and Rachel Merrell: Answer to original complaint; | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Michael E. Aleo, Esq. added for Defendant Rachel Merrell Co-Administrator/Administratrix of the Estate of Douglas Kohl | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Michael E. Aleo, Esq. added for Defendant Benedict Kohl Co-Administrator/Administratrix of the Estate of Douglas Kohl | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Benedict Kohl Co-Administrator/Administratrix of the Estate of Douglas Kohl: Service accepted by counsel; | |
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Rachel Merrell Co-Administrator/Administratrix of the Estate of Douglas Kohl: Service accepted by counsel; | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 11/09/2015 | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Paul S Weinberg, Esq. added for Plaintiff Richard M Madowitz | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.