Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Split Excavating, Inc.,, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Mclaughlin, Esq., John M, Miles, Esq., Harry L, against Gagliarducci Construction, Inc., Springfield Technical Community College, represented by Callan, Esq., Michael K, Hollander, Esq., Bart Q, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
|
Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i)
Date: November 18, 2015MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Summary Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction
Date: November 12, 2015Gagliarducci Construction, Inc.'s Memorandum in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction.
Date: November 12, 2015Affidavit of Jerome Gagliarducci, Jr.,
Date: November 12, 2015Affidavit of of Brenda Fydenkevez in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction
Date: November 10, 2015Plaintiff Split Excavating, Inc.,'s Motion for and memorandum for expedited discovery
Date: November 09, 2015Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 11/02/2015
Date: October 30, 2015Original civil complaint for Declaratory and Equitable Reflief filed
Date: October 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Summary Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (#3.0): DENIED see Summary Decision on Plaintiff's motion for Preliminary Injunction. | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Gagliarducci Construction, Inc.'s Memorandum in opposition to motion for preliminary injunction. | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jerome Gagliarducci, Jr., | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of of Brenda Fydenkevez in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to paper #3.0 plainitff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief filed by Springfield Technical Community College | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Matter taken under advisement The following event: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 11/10/2015 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held - Under advisement | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Defendant Springfield Technical Community College in support of the defendant's opposition to the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction | |
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Bart Q Hollander, Esq. added for Defendant Springfield Technical Community College |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.