Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
U.S. Bank, National Association, As Trustee For Citigroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-Amc4, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Manchini, Esq., Steven G, against Argent Mortgage Company, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Endorsement on Motion for default judgment (#8.0): ALLOWED
Date: October 02, 2015Affidavit of Attorney Steven Manchini
Date: October 02, 2015Service Returned for Other interested party Labrecque, Holly A.: Service made at last and usual;
Date: September 14, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 04, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for default judgment (#8.0): ALLOWED | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Steven Manchini | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | U.S. Bank, National Association, As Trustee for CitiGroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AMC4's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(2) Applies To: U.S. Bank, National Association, As Trustee for CitiGroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AMC4 (Plaintiff) | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered for Plaintiff(s), U.S. Bank, National Association, As Trustee for CitiGroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AMC4 after Defendant(s), Argent Mortgage Company, LLC was defaulted. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: (See #10.) Judgment mailed to Attorney Manchini, Holly Labrecque and Argent Mortgage Company, LLC. Applies To: Argent Mortgage Company, LLC (Defendant); Labrecque, Holly A (Other interested party) | |
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff: Steven G. Manchini, Esq. Other interested party: Holly A. Labrecque | |
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Other interested party Labrecque, Holly A.: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff: Steven G. Manchini, Esq. Defendant: Argent Mortgage Company, LLC | |
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Argent Mortgage Company, LLC: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | U.S. Bank, National Association, As Trustee for CitiGroup Mortgage Loan Trust Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-AMC4's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Argent Mortgage Company, LLC (Defendant); Labrecque, Holly A (Other interested party) | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Other interested party Labrecque, Holly A.: Service made at last and usual; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.