Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lepine, Pamela, Lepine, Todd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zak, Esq., Patricia A, against Senecal, France, represented by Flannery, Esq., Francis E, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Agreement for Judgment:
Date: May 02, 2016Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: writ of execution on money judgment
Date: June 06, 2016Endorsement on Motion to set aside default (#10.0): ALLOWED
Date: May 02, 2016General correspondence regarding notice of hearing for assessment of damages
Date: March 23, 2016Endorsement on Motion for a Memorandum of Lis Pendens (#3.0): ALLOWED
Date: August 11, 2015Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 07/24/2015
Date: July 24, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Execution issued on the judgment dated 05/02/2016, (#12.0) against the following party(s): France Senecal Personal Representative for Onil Langlois in favor of Todd Lepine, Pamela Lepine. In the amount of $123,352.00. | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: writ of execution on money judgment | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Agreement for Judgment: | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to set aside default (#10.0): ALLOWED | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant France Senecal Personal Representative for Onil Langlois's Assented to Motion to set aside default | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for assessment of damages (#8.0): No Action Taken See agreement for judgment filed this day. | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Francis E Flannery, Esq. added for Defendant France Senecal Personal Representative for Onil Langlois | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Case Settled | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding notice of hearing for assessment of damages | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for assessment of damages (#8.0): Hearing to be scheduled (Date and time to be selected by clerk) Other action taken |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.