Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Buckhout, Christine M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brodeur-Mcgan, Esq., Lisa, against Buckhout, Keith A., Keenan, Thomas M, Ketcher, Lisa, represented by Brady, Esq., Thomas P, Gurley, Esq., Allison K, Harding, Esq., Ronald E, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Pre-Trial ORDER: Copy mailed to counsel of record. September 2017 trial list Trial with jury
Date: November 14, 2016Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: November 14, 2016Received from Defendant Buckhout, Keith A.: Answer to the Third Party Complaint;
Date: April 15, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Buckhout, Keith A.: Service made at last and usual;
Date: April 15, 2016Endorsement on Motion to (#14.0): consolidate DENIED
Date: April 06, 2016Lisa Ketcher, Thomas M Keenan's Memorandum in support of motion to consolidate.
Date: April 05, 20163rd Party Complaint filed.
Date: March 21, 2016Endorsement on Motion to (#11.0): file third party complaint ALLOWED
Date: March 08, 2016Opposition to paper #11.0 motion for leave to file third-party complaint filed by
Date: February 29, 2016Thomas M Keenan's Memorandum in support of their motiom for leave to file third party complaint
Date: February 29, 2016Affidavit of Allison K. Gurley
Date: February 29, 2016Received from Defendant Keenan, Thomas M: Answer to original complaint;
Date: January 12, 2016Endorsement on Motion to remove default (#9.0): ALLOWED
Date: January 12, 2016Defendant Thomas M Keenan's Assented to Motion to remove Default and File Answer Late
Date: January 12, 2016Received from Defendant Ketcher, Lisa: Answer to original complaint;
Date: November 05, 2015Service Returned for Defendant Ketcher, Lisa: Service via certified mail;
Date: August 20, 2015Service Returned for Defendant Keenan, Thomas M: Service via certified mail;
Date: August 20, 2015Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 07/23/2015
Date: July 23, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Christine M Buckhout's original complaint | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Trial Ready scheduled for 09/05/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: Copy mailed to counsel of record. September 2017 trial list Trial with jury | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 11/14/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 10/14/2016 11:13:54 | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Buckhout, Keith A.: Answer to the Third Party Complaint; | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Buckhout, Keith A.: Service made at last and usual; | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas P. Brady, Esq. added for Defendant Keith A. Buckhout | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to (#14.0): consolidate DENIED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.