Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Domtar Corporation, Krawiec, Edward, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bromley, Esq., John J, Curran, Esq., Hugh R, against Gazette Printing, Llc, represented by Schuler, Esq., Thomas P, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Intervenor complaint filed.
Date: December 01, 2015JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Date: January 11, 2018ANSWER: Gazette Printing, LLC(Defendant)
Date: March 27, 2015SERVICE RETURNED: Gazette Printing, LLC(Defendant)
Date: March 17, 2015Complaint, jury claim & civil action cover sheet filed
Date: December 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Hugh R Curran, Esq. Attorney: Thomas P Schuler, Esq. Attorney: John J. Bromley, Esq. | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 05/22/2017 | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Trial Ready scheduled for 04/03/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: Trial with jury April 2017. Copy mailed to counsel of record. | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 11/28/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 10/14/2016 14:26:30 | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#11.0): discovery ALLOWED | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Gazette Printing, LLC's Assented to Motion to to extend discovery deadlines |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.