Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maraline Development Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Valicenti, Esq., David E, against Canson, Inc., represented by Aguiar, Esq., Jose Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Received from Defendant Canson, Inc.: Answer to amended complaint;
Date: April 25, 2016Notice of appeal filed Applies To: Maraline Development Corp. (Plaintiff)
Date: January 09, 2017MEMORANDUM & ORDER: on cross motions for summary judgment Mailed to counsel of record.
Date: December 28, 2016Amended: amended complaint filed by Maraline Development Corp.
Date: April 15, 2016Plaintiff Maraline Development Corp.'s Motion to amend the original complaint
Date: April 01, 2016Received from Defendant Canson, Inc.: Answer to original complaint;
Date: February 02, 2015SERVICE RETURNED: Canson, Inc.(Defendant)
Date: January 08, 2015Complaint with jury claim & civil action cover sheet filed
Date: December 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Maraline Development Corp.'s amended complaint | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 02/01/2017 11:37:47 | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Appeal: Party's Letter received re: no transcript on appeal (Rule 9 (c) (2)) Applies To: Maraline Development Corp. (Plaintiff) | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Appeal: Party's Letter received re: no transcript on appeal (Rule 8 (b) (1)) Applies To: Maraline Development Corp. (Plaintiff) | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of appeal filed Applies To: Maraline Development Corp. (Plaintiff) | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM & ORDER: on cross motions for summary judgment Mailed to counsel of record. | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (#13.0): Other action taken Maraline's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and Canson's Motion for Summary Judgment is ALLOWED (see #16 Memo and Order ) | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Matter taken under advisement The following event: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held - Under advisement | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event hearing on Summary Judgment Motion (#15.0): ALLOWED to November 21, 2016 at 2:00pm. No further notice to sssue. | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Canson, Inc.'s EMERGENCY Motion to continue / reschedule an event 10/19/2016 02:00 PM Motion Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.