Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Michael Kocak, Personally & Administrator Estate Of John W. Kocak, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Stobierski, Esq., John J, against Apple American Group, Llc, Apple New England,Llc,, represented by Doherty, Esq., Shannon Mcqueeney, Keville, Jr., Esq., William L, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Pre-Trial ORDER: January 2018 Trial List
Date: August 21, 2017Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: August 21, 2017SERVICE RETURNED: Apple American Group, LLC(Defendant)
Date: January 23, 2015SERVICE RETURNED: Apple New England,LLC,(Defendant)
Date: February 13, 2015Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed
Date: December 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Michael Kocak, Personally & Administrator Estate of John W. Kocak's original complaint | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J The following event: Trial Ready scheduled for 01/02/2018 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: John J Stobierski, Esq. Attorney: William L Keville, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Shannon McQueeney Doherty, Esq. | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 01/02/2018 Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: January 2018 Trial List | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 08/21/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 07/05/2017 10:47:46 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#6.0): ALLOWED as to discovery and Rule 56. As to Final Pre-Trial Conference, schedule for 8/2017 | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Michael Kocak, Personally & Administrator Estate of John W. Kocak's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.