Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Charette, Cynthia J., Charette, Lawrence J., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ensor, Esq., Gary A, against Quinteros, Eduardo P., represented by Leahy, Jr., Esq., John J, Markey, Esq., Patrick, Matthews, Suzanne B, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ANSWER: Eduardo P. Quinteros(Defendant) and jury claim..
Date: September 29, 2014JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order.
Date: May 26, 2016Complaint with request for jury trial & civil action cover sheet filed
Date: September 05, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Gary A Ensor, Esq. Attorney: John J. Leahy, Jr., Esq. Attorney: Patrick Markey, Esq. | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 05/16/2016 | |
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: For good cause, pretrial conference continued to April 15, 2016 @ 2:00 p.m. (supplemental PTC report to be filed) Plainitff to supplement interrogatories by 2/26/16, all expert designationsby both parties by 4/15/16. | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date John J. Leahy, Jr., Esq. added for Defendant Eduardo P. Quinteros | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 02/11/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue pre-trial conference (#5.0): ALLOWED to February 11, 2016 at 2:00 pm. | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/07/2015 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.