Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tweedie, Daniel J., filed a(n) Civil Actions With Incarcerated Party case against Garvey, Robert J., represented by Maguire, Esq., Charles M, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2014 |
CategoryCivil Actions With Incarcerated Party |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
|
Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: on motion for judgment on the pleadings
Date: April 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: on motion for judgment on the pleadings | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER on Defendant's Motion for judgment on the pleadings. (Rup, J.) | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion (P#10) Motion for judgment on the pleadings ALLOWED. (Rup, J.) Notices mailed 4/15/2015 | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Court received plaintiff's response to defendant's supplemental memorandum of law. | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Supplemental memorandum of law in support of defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings and motion to dismiss. | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#8,9 & 10) request for documents, motion to dismiss held, matter taken under advisement. (Rup, J.)) | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#11) No action required. Materials outside the complaint are not considered in a motion to dismiss, pursuant to M.R>C.P.12(b)(6) or motion for judgment on the pleadings. In any event, plaintiff previously attached these affidaivts to his opposition. (). Notices mailed 12/4/2014 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for leave to present supplemental evidence. | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear on 1/5/2014 @ 2:00 p.m. for a hearing on requests for documents, response and defendant's motion to dismiss. | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Defendant's MOTION to dismiss constitutional claims pursuant to MRCP rule 129b)(6) along with Defendant's MOTION for judgment on the pleadings pursuant to MRCP rule 12 (c). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.