Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Safety Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Thomas & Cynthia Downey, filed a(n) Torts case represented by Brennan, Esq., James Joseph, against Rowenta. Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case REMOVED this date to US District Court of Massachusetts | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice for Removal to the United States District Court filed by Rowenta. Inc. Certified copy of entire file mailed to Atty Michienzie. | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of filing notice of removal to federal court. | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Rowenta. Inc(Defendant) | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#3) ALLOWED (Bertha D. Josephson) Notices mailed 10/22/2014 | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION to enlarge the time for service of process. | |
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Case selected for review pursuant to ST.1996.c358,s.5 | |
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B05, Track A. | |
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed | |
July 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Tracking: origin/track set and mailed to Atty Brennan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.