Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dixson, Keith, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by O'Hara, Esq., Ryan K, against Dixson, Harold P, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, represented by Guillory Tadesse, Esq., Krystle, Heffernan, Esq., Lawrence P, Long, Esq., Danielle Andrews, Pro Se, Sprague, Esq., Stephanie, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Francis E. Flannery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 06, 2022Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 06, 2022Rule 9A notice of filing
Date: August 08, 2022Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: August 08, 2022Superior Court Rule 9A Affidavit of Compliance
Date: August 08, 2022Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Stephanie Sprague, Esq.
Date: August 08, 2022Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C
Date: August 08, 2022Endorsement on Motion for a Memorandum of Lis Pendens (#4.0): ALLOWED
Date: May 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED (last and usual place of abode) Applies To: Dixson, Harold P (Defendant) | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Lawrence P Heffernan, Esq. added for Defendant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Trustee for Cascade Funding Mortgage Trust HB2 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Danielle Andrews Long, Esq. added for Defendant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Trustee for Cascade Funding Mortgage Trust HB2 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Heffernan, Esq., Lawrence P (Attorney) on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Trustee for Cascade Funding Mortgage Trust HB2 (Defendant) | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Trustee for Cascade Funding Mortgage Trust HB2: Answer with a counterclaim; | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Pleading titled, Defendant Wilmington Savings Fund's Answer with Counterclaims and Crossclaims with Exhibits, filed with the court on 08/15/2022, returned to Stephanie Sprague, Esq. (per Clerk Cignoli) | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer with a counterclaim and Cross-Claims Applies To: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Trustee for Cascade Funding Mortgage Trust HB2 (Defendant) | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Krystle Guillory Tadesse, Esq. added for Defendant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Trustee for Cascade Funding Mortgage Trust HB2 | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Crossclaim filed | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Counterclaim filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.