Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts By Anthony D. Gulluni, The District Attorney For The Hampden District, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Gulluni, Esq., Anthony, Wassermann, Esq., Maida Heather, against $4,507.00 United States Currency, Montalvo, represented by O'Donald, Iii, Esq., Arthur J, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Francis E. Flannery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/17/2021
Date: May 17, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 17, 2021Opposition to Secure and Hold filed by Ricardo Montalvo (Claimant)
Date: January 26, 2022Complaint filed pursuant to G. L. c. 94C, ยง47
Date: May 17, 2021Endorsement on Request for Dismissal (#9.0): ALLOWED (Emailed 10/25/22)
Date: October 20, 2022Received from Defendant Montalvo (Claimant), Ricardo: Answer to original complaint;
Date: January 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request for Dismissal (#9.0): ALLOWED (Emailed 10/25/22) | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts by Anthony d. gulluni, the District Attorney for the Hampden District's Request for dismissal | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/29/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/12/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for a Preliminary Order to Secure and Hold Property (#3.0): ALLOWED After hearing, pursuant to G.L. c. 94C Sec.47(f) I am compelled to Allow the motion as the Commonwealth has established a nexin between the alleged illegal activity and the money seized. The defendant's argument are directed to the Qualif of the search of the premises an issue which is not before me and is under advisement by another judge. (e-mailed 05/06/22) | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Matter taken under advisement: Hearing on Forfeitures scheduled on: 05/04/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Comments: FTR - Court Room 8 Hon. Edward J McDonough, Jr., Presiding Staff: Lois Cignoli, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Preliminary Order to secure and hold: (Interlocutory to Secure and Hold) It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the HAMPDEN COUNTY NARCOTICS TASK FORCE secure and hold ($4,507.00) and safely keep until further order of the Court. Judge: McDonough, Jr., Hon. Edward J (e-mailed 05/06/22) | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Forfeitures scheduled on: 04/20/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Defendant Comments: FTR 1 Hon. Francis E Flannery, Presiding Staff: Lois Cignoli, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Flannery, Francis E |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | (#7) Service Returned for Defendant Montalvo (Claimant), Ricardo: Service via certified mail; | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion to Secure and Hold ($4,507.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY), returnable on 04/20/2022 02:00 PM Hearing on Forfeitures. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.