Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Syner, Richard, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anderson, Esq., Roy H, against Ocasio, Giovanni, represented by Cain, Esq., David R, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Francis E. Flannery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Answer with a claim for jury trial
Date: May 12, 2021JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order.
Date: August 01, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed. (Nunc Pro Tunc 4/12/21)
Date: April 16, 2021(Nunc Pro Tunc 4/15/21) Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 16, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 04/15/2021
Date: April 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported going to mediation/arbitration; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 07/27/2023 | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Withdrawal Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Vachereau, Esq., Patricia M (Attorney) on behalf of Ocasio, Giovanni (Defendant) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference (#13.0): ALLOWED Clerk shall schedule this administratively with parties to find a convenient date. (Emailed 04/03/23) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 04/03/2023 16:08:46 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 04/06/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Jeremy C Bucci, Presiding Staff: Shana Wilson, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Bucci, Jeremy C |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Syner's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 04/06/2023 02:00 PM Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Syner's Motion to continue / reschedule an event 04/06/2023 02:00 PM Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Continue Final Pretrial Conference (#12.0): DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with Superior Court R. 9A. (Emailed 03/31/23) | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 03/08/2023 11:16:56 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.