Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Trustees Of The Cherry Hill Estates Condominium Trust, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Marshall, Esq., Alan J, Schmidt, Esq., Robert Anton, against Stawarz, Jamie E, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Francis E. Flannery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
|
Service Returned for Defendant Stawarz, Jamie E: Service made at last and usual; (SON #5)
Date: January 13, 2021Endorsement on Motion to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff (#11.0): ALLOWED (em.9/9/22)
Date: September 08, 2022Short Order of Notice, returned SERVED (5) Applies To: Stawarz, Jamie E (Defendant)
Date: January 12, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: January 06, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: January 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: Schmidt, Esq., Robert Anton (Attorney) on behalf of Trustees of the Cherry Hill Estates Condominium Trust (Plaintiff) | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 01/27/2023 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert Anton Schmidt, Esq. added for Plaintiff Trustees of the Cherry Hill Estates Condominium Trust | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff (#11.0): ALLOWED (em.9/9/22) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Trustees of the Cherry Hill Estates Condominium Trust's Motion to withdraw as counsel Applies To: Marshall, Esq., Alan J (Attorney) on behalf of Trustees of the Cherry Hill Estates Condominium Trust (Plaintiff) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Alan J Marshall, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Trustees of the Cherry Hill Estates Condominium Trust | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/08/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Defendant failed to appear Hon. Michael K Callan, Presiding Staff: Lois Cignoli, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Callan, Michael K |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 08/09/2022 12:20:20 | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/08/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Michael K Callan, Presiding Staff: Lois Cignoli, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Callan, Michael K |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 07/12/2022 12:56:26 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.