Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Coakley-Rivera, Cheryl, Potter, Judith, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Mangini, Esq., Laura, against Bello, John, Carey, Paula, Gladstone, Carol, O'Brien, Charles, represented by Green, Esq., Julie Elisabeth, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Jane E. Mulqueen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJane E. Mulqueen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
|
Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: September 08, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 01, 2021Exhibits/Appendix
Date: September 01, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 12/16/2022 12:58:41 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 01/20/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Jane E Mulqueen, Presiding
Judge: Mulqueen, Jane E |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Julie Elisabeth Green, Esq. added for Defendant Charles O'brien | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Julie Elisabeth Green, Esq. added for Defendant Carol Gladstone | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Julie Elisabeth Green, Esq. added for Defendant John Bello | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Julie Elisabeth Green, Esq. added for Defendant Paula Carey | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Cheryl Coakley-Rivera, Judith Potter's Motion for Short Order of Notice on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Cheryl Coakley-Rivera, Judith Potter's Memorandum in support of of ex-parte motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or preliminary injunction. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.