Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Granger, Charlotte, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Mottor, Esq., Amy Lynn, against Trinity Health Of New England Corporation, Inc., represented by Frangie, Esq., Frederick Paul, Rymarski, Esq., Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Karen L. Goodwin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren L. Goodwin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2020 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
|
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/24/2020
Date: December 24, 2020Plaintiff Charlotte Granger's Petition for an order to conduct discovery
Date: December 24, 2020Suggestion of death filed: Applies To: Granger, Charlotte (Plaintiff)
Date: March 17, 2023Endorsement on Motion to continue Rule 16 Conference (#12.0): ALLOWED (em. 4/27/22)
Date: April 27, 2022Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 24, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Charlotte Granger failed to comply with an ORDER after review of the Docket dated 06/13/2023. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: That the complaint is hereby dismissed for failure to comply with the Order sent for Status Review. | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 08/04/2023 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Suggestion of death filed: Applies To: Granger, Charlotte (Plaintiff) | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Continue Status Conference currently scheduled on March 13, 2023. (#13.0): ALLOWED (em. 3/9/923) | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 03/13/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Edward J McDonough, Jr., Presiding Staff: Lois Cignoli, Assistant Clerk Magistrate | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Charlotte Granger's Assented to Motion to Continue Status Conference currently scheduled on March 13, 2023. | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 16 Conference scheduled on: 06/02/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR - Court Room 7 Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding Staff: Lois Cignoli, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 16 Conference scheduled on: 05/19/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding Staff: Lois Cignoli, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue Rule 16 Conference (#12.0): ALLOWED (em. 4/27/22) | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Charlotte Granger, Trinity Health of New England Corporation, Inc.'s Joint Motion to continue Rule 16 Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.