Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Manzi, Vincenzo, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against City Of Springfield, Sarno, In His Individual And Official Capacity, Domenic, Sygnator, In His Individual And Official Capacity, Peter L., represented by Curley, Esq., Cary L, Szafranski, Esq., Cary L, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Constance M. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2019 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Rule 9A notice of filing and list of documents
Date: June 28, 2019Opposition to to defendants motion to dismiss filed by Vincenzo Manzi
Date: June 28, 2019Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 16, 2019Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 16, 2019Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 05/16/2019
Date: May 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT on Defendants, Domenic Sarno, in his Individual And Official Capacity, Peter L. Sygnator, in his Individual And Official Capacity, City of Springfield 12(b) motion to dismiss against Plaintiff(s) Vincenzo Manzi. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is allowed. | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss all counts (#6.0): ALLOWED for the reasons set forth in the defendants memorandum in support of there motion to dismiss. Also, the plaintiff failed to appear in opposition. (Mailed 08/22/19) | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 08/21/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR 3 (2:04:50 to 2:08:00) Hon. Constance M Sweeney, Presiding Staff: Shana Wilson, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Sweeney, Constance M |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Defendants Domenic Sarno, in his Individual And Official Capacity, Peter L. Sygnator, in his Individual And Official Capacity, City of Springfield's Motion to dismiss all counts | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing and list of documents | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Opposition to to defendants motion to dismiss filed by Vincenzo Manzi | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Domenic Sarno, in his Individual And Official Capacity, Peter L. Sygnator, in his Individual And Official Capacity, City of Springfield's Memorandum in support of defendants motion to dismiss | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Szafranski, Esq., Cary L (Attorney) on behalf of City of Springfield, Sarno, in his Individual And Official Capacity, Domenic, Sygnator, in his Individual And Official Capacity, Peter L. (Defendant) | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Defendants's Notice of intent to file motion dismiss Applies To: Szafranski, Esq., Cary L (Attorney) on behalf of City of Springfield, Sarno, in his Individual And Official Capacity, Domenic, Sygnator, in his Individual And Official Capacity, Peter L. (Defendant) | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Cary L Szafranski, Esq. added for Defendant City of Springfield |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.