Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Greco, Kristine, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Choi, Esq., Chelsea Kim, Morneau, Esq., Jeffrey, against Delivery Express Corporation, Greco, Michael, represented by Fitzgerald, Esq., Kathleen M, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Constance M. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
|
Plaintiff Kristine Greco's Notice of appearance of Chelsea K Choi, Esq.
Date: June 16, 2021ORDER: After Status Conference
Date: October 05, 2020Kristine Greco's Memorandum in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss.
Date: January 29, 2020Defendants Delivery Express Corporation, Michael Greco's Statement of material facts
Date: January 29, 2020Delivery Express Corporation, Michael Greco's Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss
Date: January 29, 2020Service Returned for Defendant Greco, Michael: Service made at last and usual;
Date: February 01, 2018Amended: original complaint filed by Kristine Greco
Date: January 11, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 29, 2017Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/29/2017
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Kristine Greco, Delivery Express Corporation, Michael Greco's JointMemorandum Pre-Trial Memorandum | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 06/23/2021 11:45:57 Notice Sent To: Jeffrey Morneau, Esq. Connor and Morneau, LLP 273 State St Second Floor, Springfield, MA 01103 | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to vacate (#27.0): ALLOWED see endorsement (emailed 6/22/21) Judge: Goodwin, Hon. Karen
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant, Plaintiff in a Counterclaim Michael Greco, Delivery Express Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to vacate order of dismissal | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kristine Greco's EMERGENCY Motion to vacate (the Order dated May 17, 2021) | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kristine Greco's Notice of appearance of Chelsea K Choi, Esq. | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: Judgment of dismissal shall enter in thirty (30) days, on June 16, 2021, unless there is a motion filed seeking to vacate this order explaining the reason for counsel failing to appear and not being prepared to go forward at the scheduled pre-trial conference (See Pleading) (dated 05/17/21) (Mailed 05/21/21) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 06/18/2021 | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 05/17/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. John S Ferrara, Presiding Staff: Brian Dolaher, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Michael T Sarnacki, Esq., Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ferrara, John S |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 05/07/2021 14:26:00 Notice Sent To: Jeffrey Morneau, Esq. Connor and Morneau, LLP 273 State St Second Floor, Springfield, MA 01103 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.