Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hendricks, Georgia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by D'Isola, Esq., Michael Mario, Glassman, Esq., Jeffrey S, Hargrove, Esq., J. Morgan, against Crane, Andrew, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Michael K. Callan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Georgia Hendricks's Memorandum of Damages
Date: May 29, 2019Georgia Hendricks's Appendix of Exhibits to Memorandum of Damages.
Date: May 29, 2019Plaintiff Georgia Hendricks's Motion to issue duplicate execution
Date: October 25, 2023Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: June 05, 2023Rule 9A notice of filing
Date: June 05, 2023Plaintiff Georgia Hendricks's Motion to issue late execution.
Date: June 05, 2023Service Returned for Defendant Crane, Andrew: Service made at last and usual;
Date: March 01, 2018Received from Defendant Crane, Andrew: Answer to original complaint. T.O.
Date: March 26, 2018Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/29/2017
Date: December 29, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Duplicate Execution Issued. (Mailed 10/30/2023) | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for issuance of duplicate execution (#12.0): ALLOWED (mailed w/duplicate execution 10/30/23) | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Georgia Hendricks's Motion to issue duplicate execution | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Crane, Andrew Judgment Creditor: Hendricks, Georgia Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 06/15/2023 Judgment Total: 412,593.98 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Execution Subtotal: 412,593.98 Execution Total: 412,593.98 mailed 6/15/23 Judge: Brieger, Hon. Heidi E | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Application for entry of Final Judgment MRCP 33(a) After Hearing Presiding: Hon. Michael K Callan Judgment For: Georgia Hendricks Judgment Against: Andrew Crane Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 12/29/2017 Jdgmnt Date: 06/15/2023 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 248945.50 Filing Fees: 280.00 Other Costs: 53.76 Judgment Total: 412,593.98 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to issue late Execution (#10.0): ALLOWED (Emailed & Mailed 06/13/23) | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date J. Morgan Hargrove, Esq. added for Plaintiff Georgia Hendricks | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Hargrove, Esq., J. Morgan (Attorney) on behalf of Hendricks, Georgia (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.