Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alessi-Jensen, Mccartney Paige, Alessi-Jensen, Mica Sky, filed a(n) Actions Involving The State/Municipality case against Agawam High School, Agawam School Department, Lower Pioneer Valley Career & Technical Education Center, Twain School, West Springfield School Department, (total of 5) See All represented by Pelletier, Esq., Nancy Frankel, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Carey Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT on 12b motion to dismiss that the Complaint of the Plaintiffs, Micha Sky Alessi-Jensen and McCartney Paige Alessi-Jensen is hereby dismissed against the defendants Agawam School Department, Agawam High School, West Springfield School Department, Twain School, and Lower Pioneer Valley Career & Technical Education Center. (Richard J. Carey, Justice). faxed/mailed 7/21/14 | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | (filed 7/1/14) (dated 6/30/14) MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER on defendants' motions to dismiss (Richard Carey, Justice). Copies faxed & mailed 7/2/14 | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#26) ALLOWED. See Judge Carey's decision. (Cheryl Coakley-Rivera, Asst. Clerk) faxed & mailed 7/3/14 | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#20) ALLOWED - See Judge Carey's decision. (Cheryl Coakley-Rivera, Asst. Clerk) faxed and mailed 7/3/14 | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#14) ALLOWED. See Judge Carey's decision July 1, 2014. (Cheryl Coakley-Rivera, Asst. Clerk) faxed & mailed 7/3/14 | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#14, 20 & 26) dismiss held, matter taken under advisement. (Richard Carey, Justice) | |
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs' letter to the court regarding case matter. | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Atty Nancy Frankel Pelletier's withdrawal of appearance filed re: Twain School | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | List of Motion Documents. (Re #29). | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Opposition to defendents motion to dismiss filed by Mica Sky Alessi-Jensen, McCartney Paige Alessi-Jensen. (Re # 14). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.