Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Echevarria, Jesus, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Winer, Esq., Scott E, against Doe, John, Spears, Richard J, Spears, Janet, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts with John S. Ferrara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs as to Richard J Spears, John Doe's amended complaint | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Pre-trial ORDER on 4/30/2015. (mailed 5/4/15) | |
April 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum of plaintiff and defendant Richard J Spears filed | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | (Dated 4/3/2015) (P#23) DENIED without prejudice. I agree that Rule 9C has not been complied with prior to the filing of the motion. (Edward J. McDonough, Justice) Notices faxed 4/9/2015 | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | (Dated 3/24/2015) (P#19) ALLOWED (John S. Ferrara, Justice) Notices faxed 3/24/2015 | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 4/30/2015. (faxed) | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Index (re: #23) | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance (re: #23) | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of filing pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A(b)(2) (re: #23) | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Rule 9c certificate of compliance(re: #23) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.