Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Decosmo, Carmelo J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Skolnick, Esq., Scott Evans, against Doersam, Frederick J, represented by Russell, Esq., Julie Bednarz, in the jurisdiction of Hampden County, MA, . Hampden County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2007 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampden County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event | (dated 3/13/07) JUDGMENT:judgment of dismissal pursuant ST.1996.c358,s.5 after hearing. (Bertha D Josephson, Justice). Copies faxed 3/21/2007 | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed. | |
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 3/12/2007 | |
March 05, 2007 | Docket Event | (P#8) The same reasons were cited in Oct. 06 when counsel requested and was granted an 90 day extention of discovery and a new tracking order issued. Counsel should prepare a detailed pretrial memo stateing with specificity the discovery conducted to date and the precise discovery left to be conducted as discovery closed on January 19, 2007. All other pretial matters will be addressed ,* Medical expenses to date are to be detailed as well. No discovery extension beyond that has been requested. The pretrial conference will be rescheduled by the clerk's office to occur within the week. (Bertha D Josephson, Justice) Notices fx: 3/5/2007 | |
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Parties MOTION to continue Pretrial Conference for 90 days. | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 3/5/2007 | |
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Joint MOTION to continue discovery deadline to January 19, 2007. | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Frederick J Doersam's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G. | |
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Frederick J Doersam's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G. | |
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Frederick J Doersam(Defendant) (t.o.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.