Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
O'Loughlin, Michael, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts Franklin County Probate and Family Court with Sandman, Hon. Kathleen A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandman, Hon. Kathleen A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseFranklin County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: August 25, 2021Amended Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: March 06, 2023Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative
Date: March 13, 2023Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: August 25, 2021Devisees
Date: August 25, 2021Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Petition for Informal Probate
Date: August 25, 2021Will-2 pages
Date: August 25, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 03/10/2023, by Alexa S Flanders | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 03/13/2023 08:51:44 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Devisees | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Informal Probate | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Will-2 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.