Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Katherine Barelson & Terrence Joyce, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Jacobs, Esq., Michael J, against Chaffe-Cohen, Rose, Cohen, Jacob, represented by Simonelli, Esq., Patrice Leona, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with Goodwin, Karen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2023 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
This complaint is a "friendly suit" filed by Katherine Berelson and Terrence Joyce as parents and/or guardians of Declan Joyce. They are seeking the court's review and approval of a settlement for damages. The defendants in this case are Rose Chaffee...
ORDER: On Joint Petition for Approval of Settlement to Minor
Date: January 02, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 06, 2023Proposed Filings/Orders
Date: December 07, 2023Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 12/07/2023
Date: December 07, 2023Petition for Approval of Settlement agreement Pursuant to MGL C 233, section 140C 1/2.
Date: December 06, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER: On Joint Petition for Approval of Settlement to Minor | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Proposed Settlement scheduled on: 01/02/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Phone Comments: The Court heard from the parties and after hearing, the Court approved the settlement. (Simanski, FTR, FCCtRm 4, VC) Hon. Karen Goodwin, Presiding
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Filings/Orders | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 12/07/2023 | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael J Jacobs, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Katherine Barelson & Terrence Joyce As Parent and Next Friend Declan Joyce | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Approval of Settlement agreement Pursuant to MGL C 233, section 140C 1/2. | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.