Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Reagan, Dan, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Laskoski, Esq., Loren, against Berkshire East Recreation Inc, Berkshire East Ski Resort Llc, represented by Martin, Esq., William E, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with Mark D. Mason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark D. Mason Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 02/04/2021
Date: February 04, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: February 04, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: February 04, 2021Endorsement on Motion to extend time for service of process (#4.0): ALLOWED
Date: May 07, 2021Plaintiff Dan Reagan's Motion to extend time for service of process
Date: May 04, 2021Plaintiff Dan Reagan's Request for a 30 day NISI Order, case reported settled.
Date: January 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, and without costs, and without right of appeal. Applies To: Martin, Esq., William E (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire East Ski Resort LLC (Defendant); Laskoski, Esq., Loren (Attorney) on behalf of Reagan, Dan (Plaintiff) | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | other document, returned UNSERVED Notice of FPTC & Order Nisi Applies To: Berkshire East Recreation Inc (Defendant) | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 02/16/2023 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Dan Reagan's Request for a 30 day NISI Order, case reported settled. | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 01/30/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Mark D Mason, Presiding
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 01/12/2023 11:13:47 | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 01/11/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: The parties did not file a FPTC report. The Court continued the matter to 01/24/23 at 02:00 pm via Zoom. The parties shall file their report by the morning of the 24th. (Simanski, FTR, FC Ct Rm 4, Hybrid). Hon. Mark D Mason, Presiding
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 01/17/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Mark D Mason, Presiding
Judge: Mason, Mark D |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to schedule to a hearing on Berkshire Est Ski Resort's a motion for Summary Judgment (#5.0): DENIED This case remains on for trial commencing January 29, 2023. The joint motion is denied. | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant, Plaintiff Dan Reagan, Berkshire East Ski Resort LLC, Berkshire East Recreation Inc's Joint Motion to Schedule a Hearing on Berkshire East Ski Report's A Motion for Summary Judgement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.