Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Avila, John B, Sheridan, Richard, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Loew, Esq., Elliott M, against Legare, Robert, Town Of Orange Board Of Health, represented by Lynch, Esq., Carole Sakowski, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with Karen L. Goodwin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2020 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
This complaint is a legal document filed by John B. Avila, individually and as trustee of Avila Realty Trust, against the Town of Orange, Board of Health, and Building Inspector Robert Legare. The complaint alleges that the defendants exceeded their ...
Rule 9A notice of filing and list of documents
Date: February 02, 2024Joint appendix for Summary Judgment motion package filed.
Date: February 02, 2024Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#14.0): ALLOWED
Date: November 27, 2023Endorsement on Motion to continue tracking order deadlines (#13.0): ALLOWED
Date: October 04, 2023Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#12.0): ALLOWED
Date: September 06, 2023Endorsement on Motion to substitute party plaintiff (#10.0): ALLOWED
Date: January 06, 2023Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#6.0): ALLOWED
Date: April 06, 2022Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 21, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of summary judgment motion decision and plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend the judgment of dismissal. filed by Town of Orange Board of Health, Robert Legare In his/her capacity As Town of Orange Building Inspector | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Sheridan Personal Representative for the Estate of John B Avila and as Trustee 475 East Main Street Avila Realty Trust's Motion for reconsideration of its decision to dismiss the plaintiffs' complaint on summary judgment and to reconsider its decision to deny plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment (for liability only) on counts one and two of their complaint. With request for a virtual hearing on this motion. | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Sheridan Personal Representative for the Estate of John B Avila and as Trustee 475 East Main Street Avila Realty Trust's Motion to alter or amend the judgment of dismissal of the plaintiffs complaint on summary judgment with request for a virtual hearing on this motion. | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Sheridan Personal Representative for the Estate of John B Avila and as Trustee 475 East Main Street Avila Realty Trust's Notice of list of documents filed. | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Plaintiff's reply to defendants' consolidated opposition to plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of summary judgment motion decision and plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the judgment of dismissal | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Richard Sheridan Personal Representative for the Estate of John B Avila and as Trustee 475 East Main Street Avila Realty Trust's Notice of the service and intent to file motion for reconsideration and motion to alter or amend the judgments. | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT for Defendant(s), Town of Orange Board of Health, Robert Legare In his/her capacity As Town of Orange Building Inspector against Plaintiff(s), Richard Sheridan Personal Representative for the Estate of John B Avila and as Trustee 475 East Main Street Avila Realty Trust, without statutory costs.It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is ALLOWED.That the Complaint is hereby DISMISSED.
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 05/28/2024 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Disposed Hon. David Hodge, Presiding
Judge: Hodge, David |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: on cross motions for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is DENIED and the defendants' motion for summary judgment is ALLOWED. Judge: Goodwin, Hon. Karen
Judge: Goodwin, Karen |
|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Town of Orange Board of Health, Robert Legare In his/her capacity As Town of Orange Building Inspector's Memorandum in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment (supplemental) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.