Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Torrey, Tricia, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Malkovich, Esq., Michael G, Xanthakos, Esq., Stella Electra, against Kervick, James, United Personnel Services Inc, represented by Chomiak, Esq., Nicole Christine D, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts with Michael K. Callan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2019 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Default (1-88): Defendant United Personnel Services Inc: Defaulted under time standards;
Date: February 18, 2020Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 12, 2019Service Returned for Defendant Kervick, James: Service made in hand;
Date: November 27, 2019Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 12, 2019Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/12/2019
Date: September 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Tricia Torrey failed to comply with an ORDER of the Court dated 02/18/2020. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: Dismissed without prejudice. Mailed certified copies to both parties 9/25/2020. | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 06/08/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Comments: Awaiting Default judgment request from Plaintiff. Hon. Michael K Callan, Presiding
Judge: Callan, Michael K |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant United Personnel Services Inc: Defaulted under time standards; | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Kervick, James: Defaulted under time standards; | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant United Personnel Services Inc: Service made in hand; to Attorney for United Personnel Services, Inc. Scott Foster and to Mim Zayas VP of Ops for United Personnel Services. | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Kervick, James: Service made in hand; | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Defendant's Notice of intent to file motion to dismiss. Applies To: Chomiak, Esq., Nicole Christine D (Attorney) on behalf of Kervick, James, United Personnel Services Inc (Defendant) | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Nicole Christine D Chomiak, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant James Kervick | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Nicole Christine D Chomiak, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant United Personnel Services Inc | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.