Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Logan, Michelle, Logan, Richard, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Connor, Esq., John Patrick, against Prevost, Magnolia J., Prevost, Daniel J., represented by Hassett, Esq., David F, Girouard, Esq., John A, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice, Without Costs filed. | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | UNIFORM COUNSEL CERTIFICATION For Civil Cases filed by Defendant's, attorneys John A Girouard, and David F Hassett, | |
August 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendants Daniel J. Prevost and Magnolia Prevost's ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand For Jury Trial filed | |
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#5) ALLOWED (Bertha D. Josephson, J.) Notices mailed 8/26/2013 | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendants Daniel J. Prevost, and Magnolia J. Prevost's MOTION to Remove Default & File Answer Late; Assented to | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | DEFAULT (1-88) re: Daniel J. Prevost and Magnolia J. Prevost for failing to file an answer within the 1-88 time standards. | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Magnolia J. Prevost(Defendant), by serving a true and attested copy of the Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand , Letter, Sced. Order for F Track, & Ciivl Action Cover Sheet by leaving at THE LAST AND USUAL PLACE OF ABODE of Magnolia J. Prevost 39 Revere Circle Greenfield, MA 01301 (1/22/13) and by 1st class mail to same address on 1/22/13 | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: Daniel J. Prevost(Defendant) by serving a true and attested copy of the Summons & Complaint and Jury Claim, Letter, Sched. Order for F Track, Civil Action Cover Sheet by leaving atTHE LAST AND USUAL PLACE OF ABODE of Daniel J. Prevost 39 Revere Circle, Greenfield MA 01301(1/22/13) and by mailing 1st class to same address on 1/22/13 | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B20, Track F. | |
December 24, 2012 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT & Civil Action Cover Sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.