Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmahon, Sylvia, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Shea, Esq., Michael Owen, against Lundgren Honda Of Greenfield, represented by Rainville, Esq., Paul S, Hassett, Esq., David F, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, MA, . Franklin County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2013 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFranklin County, MA |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice, Without Costs filed | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Court received NOTICE of Settlement filed. Thirty (30) day Order requested. | |
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event | NISI DISMISSAL; Agreement or Stipulation to be filed by 10/21/2013 (S. Emond, Clerk.) | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Court received Defendant, Lundgren Honda of Greenfield's REQUEST FOR JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendant Lundgren Honda of Greenfield's MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Admission of Economic Losses | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendant Lundgren Honda of Greenfield's MOTION in Limine to Preclude Medical Evidence from the Plaintiff | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Defendant Lundgren Honda of Greenfield's MOTION in Limine to Preclude Introduction of Records of Medical Treatment | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's PROPOSED WITNESS LIST filed | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Sylvia McMahon's MOTION to Sequester Witnesses at Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.