Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Brenda A. Brown, filed a(n) Probate case represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Probate and Mental Health.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2004 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Probate and Mental Health |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2005 | Action |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
|
May 16, 2005 | Action |
Other Converted Document 581110-Documents Prior to 5-17-05 Filed/Issued By: DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-05 [581110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 20, 2004 | Hearing |
Petition Hearing 214710-Hearing: Probate; Guardianship of Brown, Jessica & Gerald, Jr. (G) ; Judge: J21110 Bennett Richard A. Judge: Richard A. Bennett |
|
April 20, 2004 | Action |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Apr 20 2004 Type: 551110 - Appointment of Guardian Manner : 511110 - Before Trial |
|
April 20, 2004 | Action |
Supervision Added Guardianship - |
|
April 13, 2004 | Action |
Fee Waiver Order-Grant 266110-Applic. and Order for Fee Waiver Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per |
|
April 06, 2004 | Action |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.