Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Clark, Margaret, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Macmillan, Esq., Thomas Kirwan, Yasenka, Esq., Kristin M, against Alan Lipkind As Member Of The Marblehead Zoning Board Of Appeals, Barlow, William, Benjamin Labreque As Member Of The Marblehead Zoning Board Of Appeals, Drachman, Leon, Gaunt, Julie Ann, (total of 10) See All represented by Bowser, Esq., Matthew R, Costa, Esq., Adam Joseph, Pickering-Cook, Esq., Nina L, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts with Buxton, Kristen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBuxton, Kristen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypeZoning |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Margaret Clark against several individuals, including members of the Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals and the Gaunts. The complaint appeals the denial of Clark's appeal regarding the relocation and instal...
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 08, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: December 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (#9.0): Other action taken After review, the standards for an ex parte motion hearing not been met, a short order notice shall issue returnable on 1/30/2024 at Lawrence Superior Court "C" Session. Judge: Buxton, Hon. Kristen
Judge: Buxton, Kristen |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Margaret Clark's Memorandum of law in support of plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Margaret Clark's EX PARTE Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Margaret Clark in support of motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: William Moriarty Member or alternate member of Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); William Barlow Member or alternate member of Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Alan Lipkind Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Benjamin Labreque Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Leon Drachman Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant) | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants's Notice of intent to file motion partial motion to dimiss Applies To: William Moriarty Member or alternate member of Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); William Barlow Member or alternate member of Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Alan Lipkind Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Benjamin Labreque Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Leon Drachman Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant) | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Gaunt, Rory: Service made at last and usual 27 Mugford St Marblehead Ma 01945 | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Gaunt, Julie Ann: Service made at last and usual 27 Mugford St Marblehead ma 01945 | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service in Compliance with G.L. c. 40A, sec 17 Applies To: MacMillan, Esq., Thomas Kirwan (Attorney) on behalf of Clark, Margaret (Plaintiff) Applies To: William Moriarty Member or alternate member of Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); William Barlow Member or alternate member of Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Alan Lipkind Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Benjamin Labreque Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant); Leon Drachman Member or alternate member of The Town of Marblehead Zoning Board of Appeals (Defendant) | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: Yasenka, Esq., Kristin M (Attorney) on behalf of Clark, Margaret (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.