Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brentwood Operator, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cleary, Esq., Thomas J, Leazott, Esq., Christopher J, Rogers, Esq., Jake F, against Estate Of Mabel Macdougall, Macdougall, David, Macdougall, Phillip, Macdougall, Russell, represented by Knudsen, Esq., James R, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts with Kristen Buxton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Phillip MacDougall's Memorandum in support of Motion to Dissolve Real Estate Attachment
Date: January 16, 2024Affidavit of Phillip MacDougall in support of motion to dissolve real estate attachment.
Date: January 16, 2024Writ of attachment issued approved in amount of $100,000.00
Date: December 13, 2023Opposition to plaintiff's motion for real estate attachment filed by David MacDougall
Date: November 29, 2023Defendant Phillip MacDougall's Motion to Dissolve Real Estate Attachment
Date: January 16, 2024Affidavit in Support of Motion for Assessment of Damages
Date: September 19, 2023Endorsement on Motion to Reschedule Hearing (#6.0): ALLOWED
Date: August 14, 2023Answer to original complaint AND demand for a Jury Trial. Applies To: MacDougall, David (Defendant)
Date: September 11, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 21, 2023Affidavit in Support of Motion for Real Estate Attachment
Date: July 21, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: July 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Dissolve Real Estate Attachment (#30.0): DENIED After review, the motion is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with Superior Court Rule 9A and 9C. (Dated 1/17/24) | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Phillip MacDougall's Memorandum in support of Motion to Dissolve Real Estate Attachment | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Phillip MacDougall in support of motion to dissolve real estate attachment. | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Phillip MacDougall's Motion to Dissolve Real Estate Attachment | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant's notice to dismiss plaintiff's complaint MRCP 12(b) Applies To: MacDougall, Phillip (Defendant) | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Applies To: MacDougall, Phillip (Defendant); Knudsen, Esq., James R (Attorney) on behalf of MacDougall, Phillip (Defendant) | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED On 12/13/2023 at 11:31 AM by leaving at the last and usual place of abode of Phillip MacDougall, 7 Acacia Street Gloucester, MA 01930, and by mailing 1st class to the above address on 12/15/2023. ***service made for this Defendant at different address than first return of service PL #9 dated 9/7/2023*** Applies To: MacDougall, Phillip (Defendant) | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Extend Timeframe for Service of Process (#25.0): ALLOWED Upon Review motion is ALLOWED. | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: Decision and Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Real Estate Attachment See attached (dated December 13, 2023) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brentwood Operator, LLC D/B/A The Brentwood Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center's Motion to Extend Timeframe For Service of Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.