Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Guinane, Mark G, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Pro Se, against Fitzgerald, Todd, represented by Riley, Esq., Brian Walter, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts with C. William Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2023 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Rule 9A notice of filing
Date: February 16, 2024Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: February 16, 2024Plaintiff Mark G Guinane's Assented to Motion to Enlarge Time (Filed on 12/5/2023)
Date: December 29, 2023Self-Represented Plaintiff Mark G Guinane's Motion to Enlarge Time (Filed 12/01/2023)
Date: December 04, 2023Plaintiff Mark G Guinane's Request for releasing of FOIA
Date: December 22, 2023Endorsement on Motion to enlarge time (#8.0): ALLOWED Without objection
Date: December 08, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 06, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 06, 2023Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 04/06/2023
Date: April 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Todd Fitzgerald In his/her capacity As Chief of Police of the Town of Manchester-By-the-Sea's Memorandum in support of opposition to plaintiff's public request motion and defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to plaintiff's public request motion and cross-motion for summary judgment filed by Todd Fitzgerald In his/her capacity As Chief of Police of the Town of Manchester-By-the-Sea | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement of Undisputed Facts Applies To: Todd Fitzgerald In his/her capacity As Chief of Police of the Town of Manchester-By-the-Sea (Defendant) | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Riley, Esq., Brian Walter (Attorney) on behalf of Todd Fitzgerald In his/her capacity As Chief of Police of the Town of Manchester-By-the-Sea (Defendant) | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Judgment on Pleading scheduled on: 02/27/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Lynn C Rooney, Presiding Staff: Debra Vernava, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Rooney, Lynn C |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Enlarge Time (#11.0): ALLOWED Retroactive to the date filed.(Filed on 12/5/2023) | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Mark G Guinane's Assented to Motion to Enlarge Time (Filed on 12/5/2023) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Mark G Guinane's Request for releasing of FOIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.