Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ariana Murrell, D B A Liberty Tax Service, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Sano, Esq., Joseph M, against Ma Department Of Labor Standards, represented by Pro Se, Weitzel, Esq., Richard S, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 09/07/2021
Date: September 07, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 07, 2021Plaintiff Ariana Murrell, D/B/A Liberty Tax Service's Submission of Complaint
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Applies To: Ariana Murrell, D/B/A Liberty Tax Service (Plaintiff); MA Department Of Labor Standards (Defendant) | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant MA Department Of Labor Standards's Certificate of Service | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint (Administrative Record) | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for 11/19/2021 Defendant MA Department Of Labor Standards: Service made in hand to Paul Demakis, agent and person in charge at the time of service at 19 Staniford Street 2nd floor, Boston, MA 02114. | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint Applies To: MA Department Of Labor Standards (Defendant) | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant MA Department Of Labor Standards's Notice of Appearance of Richard S. Weitzel as counsel | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 09/07/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Ariana Murrell, D/B/A Liberty Tax Service's Submission of Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.