Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Priority Motor Group, Inc., filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Salpoglou, Esq., Efpraxia Pamela, against Lopez Geraldo, Pedro Anselmo, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts with John T. Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn T. Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
|
Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 09/03/2021
Date: September 03, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs, all appellate rights waived as to Priority Motor Group, Inc.'s original complaint | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment (#3.0): Other action taken The defendant is ORDERED to surrender the vehicle to the plaintiff within 3 business days. The plaintiff is ORDERED to surrender the defendant's old vehicle at the same time at no cost. (10/4/21) (Attest: ATMitchell, Asst. Clerk) Judge: Lu, Hon. John T | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (#3.0): ALLOWED only as to the no cost exchange of vehicles or mutual agreement otherwise. | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Preliminary Injunction issued for Plaintiff Priority Motor Group, Inc.. It is ordered and adjudged that Defendant(s) Pedro Anselmo Lopez Geraldo and their various attorneys and agents are: the defendant is ordered to surrender the vehicle to the plaintiff within 3 business days. The plaintiff is ordered to surrender the defendant's old vehicle at the same time at no cost. | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 09/16/2021 12:30 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Comments: Held by Zoom Video Conference. Spanish Interpreter for Defendant - Neomicia Cano. Courtroom 2. Hon. John T Lu, Presiding Staff: Stefano J Cornelio, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Lu, John T |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se added for Defendant Pedro Anselmo Lopez Geraldo | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 09/14/2021 02:30 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: No Interpreter Available Comments: Pro Se Defendant appeared on Zoom and requested a Spanish Interpreter. Rescheduled to make arrangements for interpreter. New date and time relayed to parties on the record during Zoom. Hon. John T Lu, Presiding Staff: Stefano J Cornelio, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Lu, John T |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned on Summons & Order of Notice for Defendant Lopez Geraldo, Pedro Anselmo: Service made in hand | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction , returnable on 09/14/2021 02:30 PM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (9/14/21) Sent On: 09/07/2021 16:17:34 Notice Sent To: Efpraxia Pamela Salpoglou, Esq. Law Office of E. Pamela Salpoglou, Inc. P O Box 13, Stoughton, MA 02072 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.