Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Maddalone, Lucy, Maddalone, Saverio, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Kupperstein, Esq., Eric S, against Mcnerney, Cynthia F, Mcnerney, Peter J, represented by Warren, Esq., Ethan, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts with C. William Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeC. William Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2018 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
|
Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: January 31, 2020Suggestion of death filed: Applies To: Mcnerney, Peter J (Defendant)
Date: September 13, 2019Response to (P#10) Defendant's requested finding of facts filed by Saverio Maddalone, Lucy Maddalone
Date: September 03, 2021Plaintiffs Saverio Maddalone, Lucy Maddalone's Submission of requested rulings of law
Date: September 03, 2021Affidavit of of Eric S Kupperstein in support of attorneys fees as of 9/3/2021
Date: September 03, 2021Defendant Peter J McNerney, Cynthia F McNerney's Response to Plaintiffs' Requested Findings of Fact
Date: September 09, 2021Plaintiffs Saverio Maddalone, Lucy Maddalone's Submission of proposed findings of fact
Date: September 03, 2021Plaintiffs Saverio Maddalone, Lucy Maddalone's Submission of proposed judgment
Date: September 03, 2021Defendants' Answer and Jury Claim
Date: November 02, 2018Service Returned for Defendant McNerney, Cynthia F: Service made at last and usual
Date: September 26, 2018Service Returned for Defendant McNerney, Peter J: Service made at last and usual
Date: September 26, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs, all appellate rights waived as to Saverio Maddalone, Lucy Maddalone's original complaint | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend date of nisi dismissal (#23.0): ALLOWED Upon review and agreement | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs, Defendant Saverio Maddalone, Lucy Maddalone, Cynthia F McNerney's Joint Motion to extend date of nisi dismissal | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 01/03/2022 | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Agreement Case has settled requesting a 60-day nisi Applies To: Maddalone, Saverio (Plaintiff); Maddalone, Lucy (Plaintiff); McNerney, Cynthia F (Defendant) | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 11/10/2021 | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Waived Trial scheduled on: 09/14/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. C. William Barrett, Presiding Staff: Debra Vernava, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Barrett, C. William |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 09/10/2021 12:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. C. William Barrett, Presiding Staff: Debra Vernava, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Barrett, C. William |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Peter J McNerney, Cynthia F McNerney's Response to Plaintiffs' Requested Findings of Fact | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibits/Appendix Judge: Barrett, Hon. C. William AGREED UPON EXHIBITS
Judge: Barrett, C. William |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.