Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
R & D Site Development Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Briansky, Esq., Richard E, against Weston & Sampson Engineers, Inc., Town Of Scituate, represented by Howard, Esq., Eric Alan, Toomey, Esq., James A, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to R & D Site Development LLC, Town Of Scituate, Weston & Sampson Engineers, Inc.'s original complaint | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 09/27/2017 13:57:11 | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 10/26/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: By Court prior to date | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 09/08/2017 10:34:51 | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Amanda Mathieu, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Defendant Weston & Sampson Engineers, Inc. | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Weston & Sampson Engineers, Inc.: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Amanda Mathieu, Esq. added for Defendant Weston & Sampson Engineers, Inc. | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Eric Alan Howard, Esq. added for Defendant Weston & Sampson Engineers, Inc. | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date James A Toomey, Esq. added for Defendant Town Of Scituate | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Town Of Scituate: Answer to original complaint; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.