Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Morgan, Esq., Kristen L, against Baker-Elman Plumbing Company, Inc., Lombardi, John, represented by Flanagan, Esq., William Joseph, Roder, Esq., Mark Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, MA, . Essex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEssex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to vacate judgement of dismissal (#13.0): ALLOWED After review, motion is ALLOWED. Judgment of Dismissal for failure to comply with Nisi Order is vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal is entered. | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company Subrogee of 36 Temple Street Condominium, Baker-Elman Plumbing Company, Inc., John Lombardi's Joint motion to vacate judgement of dismissal for failure to comply with nisi order, and to enter stipulation of dismissal | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company Subrogee of 36 Temple Street Condominium, Baker-Elman Plumbing Company, Inc., John Lombardi's original complaint | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 06/12/2017 | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Kristen L. Morgan, Esq. Attorney: Mark Stephen Roder, Esq. Attorney: William Joseph Flanagan, Esq. | |
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Merrimack Mutual Fire Insurance Company Subrogee of 36 Temple Street Condominium's Request for 30-day order. Case is reported as settled. | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant's Answer and Jury Demand to Cross-Claim Applies To: Lombardi, John (Defendant) | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant files Uniform Counsel Certification. Applies To: Flanagan, Esq., William Joseph (Attorney) on behalf of Lombardi, John (Defendant) | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant John Lombardi's Answer, Cross-Claim and Jury Demand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.