Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bishop, Gloria G., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts Dukes County Probate and Family Court with Gorman, Hon. Patricia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2023 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseDukes County Probate and Family Court |
Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: February 21, 2023Will
Date: February 21, 2023Petition for Formal Probate
Date: February 21, 2023Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Devisees
Date: February 21, 2023Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Citation Filed; Served as Ordered
Date: March 16, 2023Decree and Order of Formal Probate ENTERED 3/28/23 Judge: Gorman, Hon. Patricia
Date: March 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 03/28/2023, by Hon. Patricia Gorman | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decree and Order of Formal Probate ENTERED 3/28/23 Judge: Gorman, Hon. Patricia
Judge: Gorman, Patricia |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 03/30/2023 09:10:04 | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Will | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Five (5) Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent and Waive Notice to Formal Probate, Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Devisees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.