Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aldeborgh, Tjark J., filed a(n) Equity Complaint case represented by Bixby, Esq., Brian D, Cahill, Esq., Ann Hetherwick, Lussier, Esq., Noelle L, against Aldeborgh, John E., represented by Mignanelli, Esq., Anthony R, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts Dukes County Probate and Family Court with Jacobs, Hon. Susan L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryEquity Complaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
|
Filing Court HouseDukes County Probate and Family Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment of Dismissal - by agreement of the parties - entered 5/10/22 Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Status Conference scheduled on: 05/10/2022 03:00 PM Has been: Judgment/Decree Issued Hon. Susan L Jacobs, Presiding
Judge: Jacobs, Susan L |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For All Parties to Appear Remotely ALLOWED on 05/02/2022 File Reference # 33 Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Assented to Motion For All Parties to Appear Remotely | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Continue/Reschedule ALLOWED on 03/07/2022 File Reference # 31 Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Motion To Continue/Reschedule Status Conference | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Further Temporary Order 01/14/2022, Judge: Jacobs, Hon. Susan L | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Status Conference scheduled on: 12/20/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Susan L Jacobs, Presiding
Judge: Jacobs, Susan L |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Tjark J. Aldeborgh's Pretrial Memorandum | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | John E. Aldeborgh's Pretrial Memorandum Applies To: Mignanelli, Esq., Anthony R (Attorney) on behalf of Aldeborgh, John E. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.