Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Borza, Dolores, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Kaplan, Esq., Ellen B, Sullivan, Esq., Kathryn, against Brown, Leah, Cardoza, Stephen A., Guck, Grace, Holter, Jomathan, Oak Bluffs Zoning Board Of Appeals, (total of 10) See All represented by Goldsmith, Esq., Michael A, Larkosh, Esq., Daniel James, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeZoning |
This complaint is brought by Dolores Borza against Llewellyn Rogers, Andrea Rogers, Douglas Pease, Jonathan Holter, Grace Guck, Leah Brown, Stephen A. Cardoza, Trustee of the Cardoza Family Realty Trust, and Neva and Frantz Osse. The complaint is fil...
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 21, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 21, 2023Plaintiff Dolores Borza's Notice to Town Clerk Pursuant to G.L. c. 40A. s. 17
Date: September 11, 2023Affidavit of Service in Compliance with G.L. c. 40A, s. 17
Date: September 11, 2023Opposition to paper no. filed by Neva Osse, Frantz Osse
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to paper no. filed by Neva Osse, Frantz Osse | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Allow Late Filing of Response (#8.0): ALLOWED 9/18/23 - Motion Allowed per G.L. c. 221, s. 62C(b), by T. George Davis, Clerk Applies To: Stephen A. Cardoza Trustee of and for the Cardoza Family Realty Trust (Defendant) | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael A Goldsmith, Esq. added for Defendant Oak Bluffs Zoning Board of Appeals | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Stephen A. Cardoza Trustee of and for the Cardoza Family Realty Trust: Answer to original complaint. | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Stephen A. Cardoza Trustee of and for the Cardoza Family Realty Trust's Assented to Motion to Allow Late Filing of Response | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Daniel James Larkosh, Esq. added for Defendant Stephen A. Cardoza Trustee of and for the Cardoza Family Realty Trust | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED on Stephen A. Cardoza, Trustee via Certified mail on August 23, 2023 Applies To: Borza, Dolores (Plaintiff); Stephen A. Cardoza Trustee of and for the Cardoza Family Realty Trust (Defendant) | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Dolores Borza's Notice to Town Clerk Pursuant to G.L. c. 40A. s. 17 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED on Neva and Frank Osse via Certified mail on August 23, 2023 Applies To: Borza, Dolores (Plaintiff); Osse, Neva (Defendant); Osse, Frantz (Defendant) | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service in Compliance with G.L. c. 40A, s. 17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.