Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Damora, William, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Moriarty, Esq., Robert D, against Estate Of Raphael Cypriano Magri, Nicholson, Peter, represented by Smola, Esq., Neil, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 21, 2023Answer to original complaint
Date: May 16, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Neil Smola, Esq. added for Defendant Estate of Raphael Cypriano Magri | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED on 4/27/2023. Service made at last and usual by Deputy Sheriff Kelli Stewart, Dukes County Sheriff Applies To: Estate of Raphael Cypriano Magri (Defendant) | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED on 4/27/2023. Service in-hand to Peter Nicholson by Sheriff Kelli Stewart, Dukes County Sheriff. Applies To: Peter Nicholson Personal Representative for the Estate of Raphael Cypriano Magri (Defendant) | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 04/21/2023 | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert D Moriarty, Esq. added for Plaintiff William Damora |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.